Estate of Blia Xiong et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Blia Xiong, Julie Gu Lee, Pheng Sammy Lee, John Shou Lee and Npaujnpaim Diana Lee
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Central Mortgage Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00262
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice is approved. The claims of plaintiffs are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/10/11. (mnf, )
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the 35 Stipulation for Dismissal is APPROVED. All claims against Defendant Central Mortgage Company are DISMISSED, with each party to pay their respective costs and attorneys fees. Central Mortgage Company terminated. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/30/2010. (erv, ) (Modified on 8/30/2010 added link to Stip)(erv, ).
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw by Richard Orona as Counsel of Record for Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Attorney Richard Orona is terminated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/10/2010. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Blia Xiong et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Blia Xiong
Represented By: Sanjin Mutic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Gu Lee
Represented By: Sanjin Mutic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pheng Sammy Lee
Represented By: Sanjin Mutic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shou Lee
Represented By: Sanjin Mutic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Npaujnpaim Diana Lee
Represented By: Sanjin Mutic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Alan Orona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?