Strepka v. Jonsgaard et al
Plaintiff: Mark Alan Strepka
Defendant: Gerald (I) Jonsgaard, Gerald Jonsgaard and City of Aurora, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2010cv00320
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 145 Notice of Appeal by Mark Alan Strepka, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/21/12. (bjrsl, )
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 142 The City of Aurora's Amended Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 140 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 141 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 152 Motion for Civil Rule 54(b) Certification; denying as moot 153 Motion to Amend the Final Pretrial Order. Today's order in conjunction with the Court's order of 11/16/2011 constitute this Court's final order of judgment dismissing all of the plaintiffs claims and this civil action with prejudice, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/15/12.(lsw, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. The Court AFFIRMS the Magistrate Judges Recommendation 118 . Defendant Jonsgaard's Motion for Summary Judgment 73 is GRANTED. All claims against Defendant Jonsgaard are dismissed, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/11.(lsw, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER The Clerk shall file the Final Pretrial Order as submitted by Defendants and signed by the court. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/31/2011. (kmtcd)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Four-day Jury Trial set for 3/19/2012 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/9/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/29/11. (mnf, )
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is ordered that Defendants' 102 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Exhibits is granted in part and denied in part. It is granted to the extent that Exhibits 13, 14, 16 and 21 are hereby stricken. It is recommended that Defendant Gerald Jonsgaard's 73 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Brief be granted on the basis of qualified immunity and that all claims be dismissed against Defendant Jonsgaard and he be dismissed from the case. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/18/11. (mnf, )
December 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/19/10. (mnf, )
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER accepting 62 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Denying 20 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/29/10.(ebs, )
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2010 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Compel. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2011 is VACATED. The Final Pretrial Conference is now set for 4/28/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (Court Reporter: FTR - Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 20 Defendants' Partial MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) be denied, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/8/10. (ebs, )
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Minute ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Request to: Strike Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, or in the Alternative: Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike is DENIED, and Defendants Response 54 will be considered. Plaintiffs request, in the alternative, to consider his Reply 55 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket 55 as a reply to Doc. 49 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/01/10.(jjh, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER That United States Marshal Shall Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum: The Clerk shall reissue the subpoena, with the information provided by Plaintiff, but with 10/8/10 at 2:00 p.m. as the date and time for the production of documents, and enter it into the docket. The U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the subpoena, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/15/10. (ebs, )
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part 30 Plaintiff's Request for United States Marshal's Service to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum. Clerk shall send Plaintiff a blank "Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action," signed by the clerk, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/30/10.(ebs, )
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/10. (ebs, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/18/2010. (sah, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/16/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strepka v. Jonsgaard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Alan Strepka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald (I) Jonsgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Jonsgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?