Vargas v. Nash-Finch Company
Plaintiff: Geraldine Vargas
Defendant: Nash-Finch Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00327
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Plaintiff's 20 Notice of Non-Compliance and Motion for Entry of Judgment is GRANTED and judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff, Geraldine Vargas, and against the Defendant, Nash-Finch Company d/b/a Avanza Supermarket, in the amount of $6,615.00, plus post-judgment interest as allowed under Colorado law, from the date this judgment is entered until it is fully satisfied, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 05/19/2010.(wjc, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND. The 8 Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and For Award of Just Costs and Expenses is GRANTED and reasonable fees in the amount of $6,615.00 are awarded to the Plaintiff, to be paid within 20 days, failing which judgement shall enter in favor of the Plaintiff and against the Defendant in such amount, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 04/21/2010.(wjc, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2010 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/26/2010. (kmtcd, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/19/10. (mskcd)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/18/2010. (kmtcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Nash-Finch Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Vargas
Represented By: Clifford L. Beem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash-Finch Company
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?