Nagim v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Nagim
Defendant: Bonnie F. Jackson, Alicia Pellergrin, Steven Irving, Joseph E. Abraham, Jr., Sandra Hoyt Abraham, Stephen Pugh, Brandon Freeman and Joseph E. Abraham, III
Case Number: 1:2010cv00328
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 69 is accepted. Plaintiff's objections 70 are overruled. Defendant Stephen M. Irving's Motion to Dismiss 11 is granted. The claims against him are dismissed without prejud ice for improper venue. Defendant Joseph E. Abraham, III's Motion to Dismiss 17 is granted. The claims against him are dismissed without prejudice for improper venue. Defendant Sandra Hoyt Abraham's Motion to Dismiss 19 is granted. The claims against her are dismissed without prejudice for improper venue. Defendant Joseph E. Abraham, Jr.'s Motion to Dismiss 21 is granted. The claims against him are dismissed without prejudice for improper venue. Defendants Brandon Fre min and Stephen Pugh's Motion to Dismiss 25 is granted. The claims against them are dismissed without prejudice for improper venue. Defendant Stephen M. Irving's Motion to Transfer Venue 13 is denied as moot. Joseph E. Abraham, III&# 039;s Motion to Transfer Venue 18 is denied as moot. Sandra Hoyt Abraham's Motion to Transfer Venue 20 is denied as moot. Joseph E. Abraham, Jr.'s Motion to Transfer Venue 22 is denied as moot. Bonnie F. Jackson's Motion to Dismiss 24 is denied as moot. Defendant Alicia Pellegrin's Motion to Dismiss 35 is denied as moot. This case is dismissed without prejudice as to all defendants for improper venue, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/25/10.(ebs, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgment. Plaintiff shall not file any additional pleadings until Judge Brimmer issues a decision on the Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/9/10.(ebs, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Deny the Stephen Irving Deception and Fraudulent Claims Again to this Court and the Request of Rule and Order of a Temporary and or Permanent Order. Plaintiff shall not file any further pleadings until the resolution of the pending motions, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/1/10.(ebs, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/27/10.(ebs, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file one consolidated response to Defendants' pending motions on or before 6/10/10. Denying 39 Motion to Strike. Granting 40 Amended Motion to Object, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/24/10.(ebs, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER denying 7 Plaintiff's Motions for Court Assistance of Process Service to Defendants, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/18/10.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagim v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Nagim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Pellergrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E. Abraham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Hoyt Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E. Abraham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?