Nagim v. Napolitano et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Nagim
Defendant: Janet Napolitano and Eric Holder, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00329
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. Plaintiff's 50 , 51 motions for clarification and extensions of time and 53 Motion to Show Cause, which the Court construes as a motion to alter or amend judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e), are denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/24/11.(mnfsl, )
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 56 Notice of Appeal by Ronald Nagim, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/19/11. (bjrsl, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The 31 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss is granted and the case is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/8/11.(mnf, )
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER striking 43 Motion to Complain to Court of Intellectual Dishonesty pursuant to Local Rule 7.1H. and prior 42 Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/24/11.(mnf, )
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause and to Seek Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall not file any pleading until resolution of the Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/21/11.(mnf, )
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgment. Plaintiff shall not file any additional pleadings until the Court issues a recommendation on the pending Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/8/10.(ebs, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin Party into Civil Action, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/10.(lyg, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 61 Harmless Error and/or Plaintiff [sic] Request From the Court in Respect to Rule 61 Harmless Error, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/21/10.(ebs, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/27/10.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagim v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Nagim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?