Colorado & Santa Fe Real Estate Company et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Colorado & Santa Fe Real Estate Company and Longmont Facility, LLC
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00405
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 21 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Exemplary Damages. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the First Amended Complaint attached to Plaintiffs' Reply (Doc. No. 39 -1). Defendants shall file their answer on or before 09/28/2010, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/14/2010.(wjc, )
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED 12 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 10/13/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/19/2010. (wjc, ) Modified on 8/20/2010 to correct text signature date (wjc, ).
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/24/2010. (wjc, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 10/13/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/20/2010. (wjc, )
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2010 10:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/5/2010. (kmtcd, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/4/10. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado & Santa Fe Real Estate Company et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado & Santa Fe Real Estate Company
Represented By: Marcy Marie Heronimus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longmont Facility, LLC
Represented By: Marcy Marie Heronimus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Brooks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?