Fletcher v. TravelCenters of America, LLC
Plaintiff: Doris Fletcher
Defendant: TravelCenters of America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00406
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/20/2011. (erv, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER.By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/14/2010. (sah, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/20/2010. (sah, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. A settlement conference is set for 11/04/2010 in Courtroom C-201. The conference will begin at 1:30 p.m..By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/04/2010. (sah, ) Modified on 8/5/2010 to correct the date of the settlement conference(sah2, ).
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/3/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/20/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 6/6/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Name Proper Party Defendant 11 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court shall file the First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs Motion. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/04/2010.(sah, )
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND ORDER. A scheduling/ planning Conference is set for 8/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/11/2010. (sah, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/2/2010. (kmtcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. TravelCenters of America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Fletcher
Represented By: Ian David Kalmanowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TravelCenters of America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?