Allen v. People of the State of Colorado, The
Petitioner: Gene Allen
Respondent: People of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2010cv00418
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Minute ORDER denying 24 Motion to Vacate a Judgment Denying H/C Relief. Any further filings in this case by Applicant that are unnecessary and inappropriate will be stricken by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 06/02/10.(jjh, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal after Review re 16 Notice of Appeal by Gene Allen, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/02/10. (bjrsl, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER denying 13 Motion for Discovery as inappropriate, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 3/24/10.(jak, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Dismissal. Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied for lack of jurisdiction and action is dismissed. All pending motions are denied as moot. ( 7 Motion for Hearing/Conference, 3 Motion for Leave), by Judge Christine M. Arguello for Senior Judge Zita Leeson Weinshienk on 3/18/10.(gmssl, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant shall have 30 days to file a petition and 1915 motion on the proper court forms, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. People of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gene Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?