Jones v. Pizza Hut, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alison Jones
Defendant: Pizza Hut, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00442
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice 57 is APPROVED and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/10/11. (jjh, )
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Grant Additional Interrogatories, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/11.(mnf, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference for 1/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/2010. (erv, )
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 10/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/19/10. (gmssl, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/1/2010. (ervsl, )
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 10/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/17/2010. (erv, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Minute ORDER: Plaintiffs letter/motion filed April 16, 2010 22 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The portion of the letter requesting reversal of the motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motiion [sic] to Dismiss for Failing to File an Answer on Time 20 is WITHDRAWN. The portion of the letter requesting reconsideration of the order denying Plaintiffs request for appointment of counsel is DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/19/2010.(kmtcd, )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/03/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Pizza Hut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza Hut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?