Haden v. Zavaris et al
Plaintiff: Steven T. Haden
Defendant: Ari Zavaris, Steven Green, John Suthers and Buena Vista Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2010cv00515
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 316 Motion to Alter Judgment. To the extent that it asks that the Court alter or amend its judgment it is DENIED. To the extent that the motion requests that the Court grant leave to appeal in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 it is GRANTED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/29/13. (alvsl)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment 301 is GRANTED. The Court directs that a final written judgment be entered dismissing this case and all claims within it with prejudice. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/28/13. (alvsl)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on July 22, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for June 28, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. Counsel who will by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/07/2013. (rbjsec. )
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER. Magistrate Judge Tafoya's recommendation 276 is ADOPTED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 177 is GRANTED. The claims against all defendants except Dr. Shepard, who was not a party to the motion, are dismissed with prejudice. The parties are directed to contact Chambers promptly to set an early trial date on the remaining claims. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/29/13. (alvsl)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER denying 112 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; denying 160 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; adopting 176 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/12. (alvsl)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Preliminary Scheduling Conference as to defendant Shepard ONLY set for 9/12/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/30/2012. (kmtcd)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Show Cause 261 is DENIED in part. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/7/2012.(sahsl, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Status Conference held on 1/11/2012, denying 168 Motion for Order, granting 215 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, and granting in part and denying in part 217 Motion to Clarify. For further information, please see minutes. (FTR: Courtroom C-201) (kmtcd)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER denying 207 Follow-Up Request (Second) for Photocopies. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/21/11.(lsw, )
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE ORDER granting 195 Request for Photocopies; denying 196 Discovery Preservation Request; granting 197 Motion to Clarify. Defendants may file their reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 12/19/2011. The Clerk shall send copies of Docket Numbers 192 and 193. No further copies of documents will be provided by the Court, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/12/11.(lsw, )
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Second ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshall re: 166 MOTION Seeking Service, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/8/11. (Attachments: # 1 Process Receipt and Return) (lsw, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying without prejudice 148 Motion Seeking Leave of Court, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/4/11.(lsw, )
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER. Plaintiff's claims against John Butterfield, Kenneth Dewalt, Joseph Determan, and Michael Hughes are dismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/15/11. (mnf, )
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/22/11. (mnf, )
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER. Plaintiff's 64 Prisoner Complaint Request to Amend Defendants, construed as a Motion to Amend Complaint, is denied in part and granted in part. Defendants' 32 Motion to Dismiss the Third and Final Amended Complaint (Doc. 18 ) in Part Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is granted in part and denied in part. The 63 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge re defendants' motion to dismiss is accepted in part and rejected in part. The 113 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge re plaintiff's motion to amend is accepted in part and rejected in part. Plaintiff's 127 Motion to Amend Filing is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/13/11.(mnf, )
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER denying 114 Plaintiff's Request Leave of Court. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/5/11.(mnfsl, )
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. Plaintiff's 84 Notice of Related Cases and Motion to Join Cases is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed also to file this Order in Case No. 10-cv-01448-PAB-BNB, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/23/11.(mnf, )
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 72 Motion to Compel Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/11.(mnf, )
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER denying 77 Motion Requesting U.S. Marshall [sic] to Complete Service, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/1/11.(mnf, )
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER accepting 53 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Denying 49 Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/29/10.(ebs, )
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 49 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Steven T. Haden, Be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/2/2010. (erv, )
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 18 Amended Complaint, filed by Steven T. Haden by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Form)(erv, )
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Second ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2010 10:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/18/10. (ebs, )
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting U.S. Marshall [sic] to Complete Service, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/8/10.(ebs, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/21/10. (ebs, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/14/10. (lyg, )
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw in Part to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendants Ari Zavaras, Chief of Psychiatry, Chief Medical Officer and John Suthers are dismissed as parties to this action for lack of personal participation . The Clerk of the Court is instructed to remove Defendants Ari Zavaras, Chief of Psychiatry, Chief Medical Officer and John Suthers as named parties to the suit. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 07/09/2010. (sah, )
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/01/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to File Third and Final Amended Compplaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/13/10. (jjh, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw the Second Amended Complaint 6 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to strike Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and the merits of the Amended Complaint will not be addressed by the Court. Plaintiff is again directed to file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with the April 2 Order if he wishes to proceed with his claims in this action. Plaintiff must file the Second Amended Complaint on or before May 7, 2010 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/15/10.(jjh, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/02/10. (jjh, )
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute ORDER denying as premature 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and denying as premature 5 Motion to Appoint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/16/10.(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haden v. Zavaris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven T. Haden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Zavaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?