Richfield Hospitality, Inc. v. Shubh Hotels Pittsburgh, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richfield Hospitality, Inc.
Defendant: Shubh Hotels Pittsburgh, LLC, Shubh Hotels Detroit, LLC and Atul Bisaria
Case Number: 1:2010cv00526
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Address Specific Dollar Amount of December 10, 2010 Judgment Against Atul Bisaria on the Detroit Note is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Shubh Hotels Detroit, LLC is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Atul Bisaria on the Pittsburgh Note is granted. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/26/11.(mnf, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment Entered Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) and 55 Against Defendant Shubh Hotels Detroit, LLC. The 25 12/10/2010 judgment is vacated as to Shubh Detroit only. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/16/11.(mnfsl, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Plaintiff's motion to dismiss all claims against defendant Shubh Hotels Pittsburgh, LLC. All of plaintiff's claims against defendant Shubh Hotel Pittsburgh, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/15/11.(mnf, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 6/8/2011. Plaintiff's Oral Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Correct Judgment... is Granted, and, withdrawing without prejudice 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) or in the Alternative to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Plaintiff Richfield Hospitality, Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. The portion of plaintiff's motion seeking default judgment as to Count 1 of the First Amended Complaint is grante d. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendants Bisaria and Shubh Detroit as to Count 1 of the First Amended Complaint. The portion of plaintiff's motion seeking entry of default judgment as to Count 2 of the First Amended Complaint is denied. Denying as moot 23 Plaintiff's Motion for a Hearing, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/9/10.(ebs, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/10 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/23/10.(ebs, )
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/26/2010. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richfield Hospitality, Inc. v. Shubh Hotels Pittsburgh, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richfield Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Ann Grandjean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shubh Hotels Pittsburgh, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shubh Hotels Detroit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atul Bisaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?