Espinoza v. Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Bobby Espinoza
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2010cv00548
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Stay. This matter is stayed until the appeal in this case has been briefed and a ruling has been made by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/25/12.(mnfsl, )
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Trial Preparation Conference, scheduled for November 14, 2011, and the five-day jury trial, scheduled for November 28, 2011, are VACATED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/21/2011.(erv, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/15/2011; 21 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Disposition is DENIED. Discovery deadline is extended to 3/11/2011 for the sole purpose of completing the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. Dispositive Motions deadline is extended to 4/1/2011. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd )
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. The 21 Motion for Protective Order is held in abeyance pending a hearing on 2/15/2011 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. The 23 First Motion for Extension is denied without prejudice. The 26 Second Motion for Extension is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/7/11.(mnf, )
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Allowance of Three Additional Interrogatories. Parties permitted to propound a total of twenty-eight (28) interrogatories, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/14/10.(mnf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Espinoza
Represented By: William Sidney Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?