Cuevas v. Trani et al
Petitioner: Vanessa Cuevas
Respondent: Travis Trani and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2010cv00570
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute ORDER Denying Request for Stay of Mandate and Request for Appointment of Counsel 25 . The request for appointment of counsel is moot because this action was dismissed on 06/10/10 by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 07/14/10.(jjh, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider. Ordered that the "Response to Judgment Order to Dismissing Action for Procedural Barring Combined with Motion for Stay of Decision is denied by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/25/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Dismissal. Ordered that the application and the amended application are denied and the action is dismissed because Applicant's claims challenging her conviction re procedurally barred. Ordered that no certificate of appealability will issue because Applicant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/09/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 21 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 21 days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/16/10. (jjh, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Applicant to File a Amended Application within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/02/10. (jjh, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant shall have 30 days to file a certificate showing balance in prison account, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/9/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuevas v. Trani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vanessa Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Travis Trani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?