LawyerDoneDeal Corp. v. ATGF Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LawyerDoneDeal Corp.
Defendant: ATGF Holdings, LLC, Edward A. Winfrey and Jeremiah Garza
Case Number: 1:2010cv00586
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion For Entry of Stay or, in the Alternative, for Administrative Closure. The case is stayed up to and including 9/28/10. Joint Status Report or a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice due by 9/28/2010, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/14/10.(lyg, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: denying as moot 10 Motion to Stay. On or before July 14, 2010, the parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Scheduling conference set for April 28, 2010, at 9:00 a.m., and all related deadlines are VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/19/10.(bnbcd, )
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/23/10. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LawyerDoneDeal Corp. v. ATGF Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LawyerDoneDeal Corp.
Represented By: Peter C. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATGF Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Winfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?