Munroe v. Astrue et al
Plaintiff: Lori Munroe
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue and U.S. Social Security Administration, The
Case Number: 1:2010cv00661
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). Upon review of the 66 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney's fees, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/4/11.(gms, )
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/11. (gmssl, )
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Motion Hearing was held on 1/11/2011. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Rule 26(b)(5)(B) Motion for In Camera Review and Determination on Defendant's Claim of Privilege or Protection, doc # 30 , is GRANTED. Defendants may file an Objection within 14 days. ORDERED: The parties shall file an Amended Prooposed Scheduling Order on or before JANUARY 21, 2011. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Telephonic Motion Hearing was held on 10/15/2010. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion # 39 for Leave to File a Surreply is GRANTED. Doc #[39-1] is accepted for filing. Plaintiff may file a Response to the Surreply by 10/22/2010, then briefing is CLOSED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/8/10. (cbssec)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Rule 16 Conference set for 3/29/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/2/10. (msksec, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 6/2/2010 at 8:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/24/10. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munroe v. Astrue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Munroe
Represented By: Rhonda Lynn Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Social Security Administration, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?