Ryskamp v. Looney et al
Plaintiff: Denis Ryskamp
Defendant: Joel W. Looney, Dean L. Jacobson, Richard I. Barr, Susan L. Ciciora, John S. Horejsi and Boulder Growth & Income Fund, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00842
Filed: April 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER Issuing Final Approval of Derivative Litigation Settlement and Granting Application for Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses and Plaintiff's Award. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Derivative Litigation Settlem ent 267 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Plaintiff's Award 261 is GRANTED. The Court ISSUES final approval of the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement entered into between the parties to this action ( 253 -1). This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, subject only to the Court's continuing jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the parties settlement, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/14/12.(sgrim)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Preliminary Approving Derivative Litigation Settlement and Providing for Notice of Settlement. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Litigation Settlement ECF No. 252 , is GRANTED. A hearing (the Settlement Hear ing) shall be held before this Court on July 31, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A801 at the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294-3289; The stay issued on January 25, 2012 pending the parties filing of settlement papers is hereby LIFTED; and The two pending Motions to Dismiss filed on December 16, 2011 ECF No. 196 , 198 , are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/20/2012.(ervsl, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 207 Defendants' Motion for Order to Sequence Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/27/2012.(ervsl, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTE ORDER granting 231 Plaintiffs Renewed Unopposed Motion to Restrict Access to Plaintiffs Opposition to Susan L. Cicioras and John S. Horejsis Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 8(a), 9(b) and 12(b)(6). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Cle rk of the Court is directed to maintain the following document UNDER SEAL at a LEVEL 1 access restriction:1 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Susan L. Cicioras and John S. Horejsis Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 8(a), 9(b) and 12(b)(6) 230 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/30/2011.(ervsl, )
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 209 Initial Motion to Stay; granting 236 Motion to Stay and all discovery is STAYED through and including March 12, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending Answer deadlines and the Scheduling Conference set for February 13, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. are VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/25/2012.(ervsl, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MINUTE ORDER granting 212 First Motion for Order to Restrict; granting 217 Second Motion for Order to Restrict; granting 226 Motion to Strike, STRICKEN 219 Restricted Document - Level 1, and STRICKEN 222 Response to Motion, Plaintiff may re-file his Response to Defendants Susan L. Ciciora and John S. Horejsis Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 8(a), 9(b), and 12 (b)(6) 198 no later than January 23, 2012. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/18/2012.(ervsl, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE ORDER granting 162 Plaintiffs Unopposed Joint Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his proposed Third Amended Complaint on or before November 30, 2011. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint on or before December 7, 2011 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/2011.(ervsl, )
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 154 Unopposed Joint Motion for Order to Apply Stipulated Protective Order and Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Orders to the New Defendants Named in Second Amended Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/10/2011.(ervsl, )
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 110 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, with regard to the Interview Memoranda by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/16/2011.(erv, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 SECOND PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/12/2011. (klmcd )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/6/2011. (klmcd )
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/28/2011. (klmcd )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry for Motions Hearing held before Judge William J. Martinez: ORDERED: The Court finds the interests of justice will best be served by ordering Defendants to provide the Plaintiff with all the initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A ) on or before May 10, 2011. The disclosures shall include copies of all documents referenced therein. Any dispute as to such disclosures shall be directed to the District Judge and will not be referred to the Magistrate Judge. ORDERED: Defendants shall provide the Plaintiff all information and documents sought in the February 23, 2010 letter from Plaintiff's counsel to Defendants' counsel, which is Exhibit I to Nominal Defendant Boulder Growth and Income Fund, Inc., And The Review Committee Members' Request for Judicial Notice 34 . Any dispute shall be directed to the District Judge and will not be referred to the Magistrate Judge. ORDERED: Plaintiff has up to and including May 31, 2011 to file a Second Amended Complai nt. ORDERED: Nominal Defendant Boulder Growth And Income Fund, Inc., And the Review Committee Members' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 8(a), 12(b)(6), And 23.1, 32 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILE. ORDERED: Defendants' Horej si and Ciciora's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 23.1(a), 35 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILE. ORDERED: Defendants have up to and including June 24, 2011 to refile their Motions to Dismiss, with respect to the Second Amended Complaint.ORDERED: Except as set forth above, the Magistrate Judge's Order staying discovery 61 shall remain in effect.(Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel) (wjmcd, )
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2011. (erv, )
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay; granting 54 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of the Dispositive Motions Currently Pending before the Court. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/21/2010.(erv, )
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendants Unopposed Motion for for a Uniform Response Date to the Verified Corrected Derivative Complaint and a Coordinated Briefing Schedule. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or oth erwise respond to the Amended Complaint 11 on or before June 25, 2010. Plaintiffs shall file a response to any motion to dismiss filed by Defendants on or July 26, 2010. Defendants may file a reply, if any, in support of their motion(s) to dismiss on or before August 26, 2010. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/11/2010.(erv, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/4/2010.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryskamp v. Looney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Ryskamp
Represented By: Kip Brian Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel W. Looney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean L. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard I. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Ciciora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Horejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Growth & Income Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?