Romero v. Zavaras et al
Plaintiff: Timothy C. Romero
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras, Beverly Dowis and Gary Pardos
Case Number: 1:2010cv00902
Filed: April 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the complaint and this action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rules of Procedure 41(b) for failure to file an Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and an Amended Complaint within the time allowed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/23/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Submit Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/15/10. (jjh, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Vacating Order of Dismissal and Judgment. Ordered that the 06/22/10, Order of Dismissal and Judgment are vacated. Ordered that the Plaintiff, Timothy Romero, is directed to file an Amended Complaint that complies with Magistrate Judge Boland's 06/14/10 Order for Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/29/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the Prisoner Complaint and the action are dimsissed without prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/21/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk (jjh, )
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/14/10. (jjh, )
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/20/10. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy C. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Pardos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?