Vastani Company S.A. v. Mexoro Minerals Ltd.
Plaintiff: Vastani Company S.A.
Defendant: Mexoro Minerals Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01050
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Renew Judgment and to Conduct a Debtor's Examination. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 11/1/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/26/2011.(wjc, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 the Motion to Withdraw. Leo F. Milan is terminated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/9/2011. (mehcd)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Plaintiff's Amended Unopposed Motion to Reopen Case and for Amendment of Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/19/2011. (mehcd)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 35 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reopen Case and for Amendment of Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/8/2011. (mehcd)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate F.R.C.P. Rule 69 Hearing set for 1/4/2011, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/4/2011. (mehcd)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. This Court has jurisdiction over this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a)(1) and venue in this Court is proper under 28 U.S.C. § 1391(a). Mexoro Minerals 26 confesses judgment in favor of the Plaintiff in the amount of $12 0,000.00 due 01/30/2010. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Judgment in favor of Vastani Company, S.A. and against Mexoro Minerals Ltd. in the amount of $120,000.00 plus pre- and post- judgment interest at the applicable statutory rate, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/13/2010. (wjc, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER vacating 3 Order of Reference and 17 Trial Preparation Order. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to convene such settlement conferences and direct related proceedings as may facilitate resolution of this case. Status Conference set for 8/23/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/27/2010. (wjc, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Rule 16 Hearing set for 3/24/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/19/10. (msksec, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/28/10. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vastani Company S.A. v. Mexoro Minerals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vastani Company S.A.
Represented By: John Henry Schlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mexoro Minerals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?