Under Armour, Inc. v. Hot Gear, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Under Armour, Inc.
Defendant: Ivan E. Petkov, Petkov Ent and Hot Gear, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv01069
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2010 Filing 45 REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Commissioner of Trademarks. (lyg, )
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/9/2010. (erv, )
November 8, 2010 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kitaev, Erica)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting #40 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Dismissal papers due by 11/8/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/12/2010. (mehcd)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding #40 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #39 Order on Motion to Reset, RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Under Armour, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/8/2010. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(erv, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #39 Order on Motion to Reset, RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Kitaev, Erica)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Settlement conference. Settlement Conference RESET for 10/18/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/8/2010. (mehcd)
September 8, 2010 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM regarding #37 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Settlement Conference filed by Petkov Ent, Ivan E. Petkov, Hot Gear, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/8/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
September 8, 2010 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Settlement Conference by Defendants Hot Gear, LLC, Ivan E. Petkov, Petkov Ent. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McFarland, J.)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED #24 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Hegarty; granting #19 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Ivan E. Petkov, an individual, on behalf of himself and on behalf of Defendant Hot Gear, LLC, ; It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Amended Answer #25 is accepted for filing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/31/2010.(erv, )
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER Settlement Conference reset for 9/20/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/31/2010. (mehcd)
August 24, 2010 Filing 34 Docket Annotation re: #33 Scheduling Order. This docket entry was modified to add the correct pdf. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (gmssl, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/20/2010. (mehcd) (Main Document 33 replaced on 8/24/2010) (gmssl, ). Modified on 8/24/2010 to add the correct pdf (gmssl, ).
August 19, 2010 Filing 32 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 8/19/2010. Discovery due by 3/7/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2011. Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2011 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
August 16, 2010 Filing 31 Clerk's NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT : default will not be entered as to Hot Gear, LLC, Ivan E. Petkov, Petkov Ent. (sah, )
August 13, 2010 Filing 30 AMENDED Affidavit to #8 Summons Returned Executed for Petkov Ent. by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kitaev, Erica) (Modified on 8/16/2010 the affidavit was Amended as to Patkov Ent, not as to the USA)(erv2, ).
August 12, 2010 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Quiat, Laurin)
August 12, 2010 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Hot Gear, LLC filed by Defendant Hot Gear, LLC. (McFarland, J.)
August 12, 2010 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Petkov Ent. filed by Defendants Hot Gear, LLC, Ivan E. Petkov, Petkov Ent. (McFarland, J.)
August 10, 2010 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Hot Gear, LLC.. (McFarland, J.)
August 10, 2010 Filing 25 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hot Gear, LLC, Ivan E. Petkov, Petkov Ent.(McFarland, J.)
August 10, 2010 Filing 24 RECOMMENDATION to grant #19 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike #18 Answer as to Hot Gear, LLC, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/10/2010. (mehcd)
August 5, 2010 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Hot Gear, LLC filed by Under Armour, Inc., #19 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint as to Hot Gear, LLC filed by Under Armour, Inc., #21 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Petkov Ent. filed by Under Armour, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/5/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/5/10. (wydcd, rrk)
August 5, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Petkov Ent. by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Kitaev, Erica)
August 5, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Hot Gear, LLC by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Kitaev, Erica)
August 5, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint as to Hot Gear, LLC by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Kitaev, Erica)
July 30, 2010 Filing 18 STRICKEN Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ivan E. Petkov and on behalf of Hot Gear, LLC.(lyg, ) (Modified on 8/31/2010 Stricken pursuant to #36 Order)(erv, ).
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Plaintiffs unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset the Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference RESET for 8/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/16/2010.(erv, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/15/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(lyg, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Kitaev, Erica)
July 15, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Erica Gann Kitaev on behalf of Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc. by Erica Gann Kitaev on behalf of Under Armour, Inc. (Kitaev, Erica)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' Answer or other response due by 8/2/2010. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/12/2010. (mehcd)
July 9, 2010 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint filed by Petkov Ent, Ivan E. Petkov, Under Armour, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/9/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
July 8, 2010 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendants Ivan E. Petkov, Petkov Ent, Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc.. (erv, )
July 6, 2010 Filing 10 Docket Annotation re: #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, A wrong event was used during the docketing of the Summons Return. This was not as to the USA and it has been correced to reflect the Summons Returned Executed were served by the Plaintiff Under Armour, Inc., upon the Defendants, on 6/21/2010 and the Answer Due Date has been corrected to reflect 7/12/2010. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (erv, )
June 29, 2010 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Under Armour, Inc., upon defendant(s) Ivan E. Petkov served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Quiat, Laurin) (Modified on 7/6/2010 Filer corrected to Under Armour, Inc., and answer due date to 7/12/2010)(erv, ).
June 29, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Under Armour Inc.,upon Petkov Ent. defendant(s) served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Quiat, Laurin) (Modified on 7/6/2010 Filer corrected to Under Armour, Inc., and answer due date to 7/12/2010)(erv, ).
June 29, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Under Armour, Inc., upon Hot Gear, LLC defendant(s) Hot Gear, LLC served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Quiat, Laurin) (Modified on 7/6/2010 Filer corrected to Under Armour, Inc., and answer due date to 7/12/2010)(erv, ).
May 19, 2010 Filing 6 Docket Annotation re: #5 Affidavit/Return of Service. This was entered in error by clerk. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (jjh, )
May 19, 2010 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Charisha Cruz on behalf of the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Colorado (jjh, )
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/17/2010. (mehcd)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/12/10. (wydcd, rrk)
May 11, 2010 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Commissioner of Trademarks (jak, )
May 7, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hot Gear, LLC, Ivan E. Petkov, Petkov Ent ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 27945) Summons Issued, filed by Under Armour, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Under Armour, Inc. v. Hot Gear, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan E. Petkov
Represented By: J. Lucas McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petkov Ent
Represented By: J. Lucas McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Gear, LLC
Represented By: J. Lucas McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Under Armour, Inc.
Represented By: Erica Gann Kitaev
Represented By: Laurin D. Quiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?