MKBS, LLC v. Research Underwriters, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MKBS, LLC
Defendant: Research Underwriters, LLC, Financial Associates, Inc. and Stephen Friedberg
Case Number: 1:2010cv01326
Filed: June 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 80 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/19/2011 is VACATED. The jury trial set for 9/12/2011 is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/2011. (sah, )
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER. The parties Stipulated Motion to AmendScheduling Order 74 is GRANTED. Discovery due by 6/30/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/2011.(sah, )
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/13/2011. (klmcd )
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER holding in abeyance 47 Motion for Protective Order pending a telephonic discovery conference with the parties, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/20/10.(mnf, )
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) 34 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall accept Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [34-1] for filing as of the date of this order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/30/2010.(sah, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/23/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/19/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eleven (11) day Jury Trial set for 9/12/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Notice of Dismissal of Research Underwriters, LLC Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 41 12 filed 07/12/2010, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, Research Underwriters, LLC, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant, Research Underwriters, LLC, is DROPPED as a named party to this litigation, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/13/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MKBS, LLC v. Research Underwriters, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MKBS, LLC
Represented By: Jamey W. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Underwriters, LLC
Represented By: Miles Leachman Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Miles Leachman Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Friedberg
Represented By: Miles Leachman Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?