A AAA Custom Plumbing Corporation et al v. Trirx Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: A AAA Custom Plumbing Corporation, Absolute Health Center, Inc., Alan Bau Invetments, Advantage Heating & Cooling, Inc., Richard J. Druml, Copy Cat LLC, Chirocare, P.C., Frank J. Dexter, Complete Packaging, Inc., Colorado's Ride the West R.V. Rentals, Inc., Dynamic Auto Glass, Inc., Dry Creek Chiropractic Center, P.C., Denver Mill and Lathe, Inc., Falcon Distributing, Inc., Fluorescent Maintenance Company, Foils & Dies, Inc., Guiry's, Inc., Go West Genuine, LLC, Hiebert Company, The, Hawtree Incorporated, Innovative Woodworking, Inc., LAQ Ventures, Inc., Lou Zier Insurance Agency, Inc., B & W Enterprises, LLC, A Better Way Realty, LLC, Milestone Technologies, Inc., Ryan H. Johnston, Richard H. Krening, Security Chiropractic Clinic, P.C., Southeast Denver Graphics, Inc., Stack Optical Service, Inc., Thatcher Chiropractic, P.C., US Fax Law Center, Inc., Personal Touch Engraving, Inc., The and Bonnie Warner
Defendant: Trirx Ltd., National Telemedicine Center Inc., Apollo M. Arcallana, Jack E. Pickering, David (I) B. Winkles and David B. Winkles
Case Number: 1:2010cv01420
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying without prejudice 42 Plaintiffs' Second Amended Verified Motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to Defendants National Telemedicine Center Inc., Apollo M. Arcallana, and Jack E. Pickering. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint within thirty days of the entry of this order and to thereafter renew their motion for default judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/9/11.(mnf, )
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 35 Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to Defendants National Telemedicine Center Inc., Appollo M. Arcallana, and Jack E. Pickering, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/5/11.(mnf, )
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Plaintiff's amended motion for entry of default judgment 35 is accepted for filing, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/17/10.(ebs, )
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER: granting 36 Plaintiffs Second Motion to Vacate SchedulingConference. The Scheduling Conference set for November 30, 2010, is VACATED, to be reset at a later date, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/10/10.(bnbcd, )
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 11/30/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/7/10.(ebs, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/10. (bnbcd, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID B. WINKLES: All claims asserted against defendant David B. Winkles, individually and d/b/a Winkles' Pharmacy, are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Denying as moot 6 Defendant Winkles' Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/13/10.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A AAA Custom Plumbing Corporation et al v. Trirx Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A AAA Custom Plumbing Corporation
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Absolute Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Bau Invetments
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advantage Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Druml
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copy Cat LLC
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chirocare, P.C.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank J. Dexter
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado's Ride the West R.V. Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Auto Glass, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dry Creek Chiropractic Center, P.C.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Mill and Lathe, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falcon Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fluorescent Maintenance Company
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foils & Dies, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guiry's, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Go West Genuine, LLC
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiebert Company, The
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawtree Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Woodworking, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAQ Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Zier Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & W Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Better Way Realty, LLC
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milestone Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan H. Johnston
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard H. Krening
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Chiropractic Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Denver Graphics, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stack Optical Service, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thatcher Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Fax Law Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personal Touch Engraving, Inc., The
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Warner
Represented By: Richard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trirx Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Telemedicine Center Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo M. Arcallana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack E. Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) B. Winkles
Represented By: Carolyn J. Fairless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Winkles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?