Jones et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: William Jones and Carolyn Jones
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv01429
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND ORDER OF REFERENCE. Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer is designated to convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case. The 6 Order of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge is VACATED. The Rule 16 Conference set for 07/12/2011 is VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/01/2010. (wjc, )
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Rule 16 Hearing set for 7/12/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/24/10. (msksec, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/23/2010 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/28/10. (cbssec)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 8/4/2010 at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/23/10. (cbssec)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/22/10. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jones
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: J. Ryan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?