Asher v. Colgate-Palmolive Company
Plaintiff: Randall S. Asher
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv01468
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 131 Opinion and Order. By Clerk on 09/14/2012. (klyon, )
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 OPINION AND ORDER CONSTRUING PATENT, GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ANDDENYING MOTION TO RESTRICT ACCESS. The Court GRANTS Colgate's Motion for Summary Judgment (# 79 , 82 ). The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Colg ate and against Dr. Asher on all claims herein. Colgate's Motion to Restrict Access (# 81 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of the Court shall lift all access restrictions on the main document in Docket # 79 , as well as on th e exhibits to that entry designated as A-10 and A-17; however, the exhibit denoted as A-9 shall remain under a level 1 restriction. The Clerk of the Court shall lift all restrictions on all components of Docket # 93 . Colgate shall immediately publicly-file a redacted version of Exhibit A-9, as set forth above within 14 days. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/12/2012.(klyon, )
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Pursuant to the December 30, 2011 Order of this court 105 Order on Motion for Sanctions, the Plaintiff is awarded the total sum of $4,287.50 as sanctions against the Defendant. The Defendant shall render payment in full of the sanction amount jointly to Plaintiff and his counsel, Eric G. Fischer, within 15 days of this Order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/3/2012. (kmtcd)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 ( 76 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37. Defendant shall pay all attorneys fees and costs incurred by Plaintiff in investigating and bringing forth the issue of Defendant's incorrect response to Interrogatory No. 8, including the drafting of court pleadings and review of discovery as well as appearing in Court to argue the motion and prepare the supplemental response. Defendant shall bear the costs of Plaintiff's filing of an itemized accounting of the attorney's fees and other costs as awarded herein. The motion is denied in all other respects. Plaintiff shall file his attorney's fees and costs accounting on or before 01/12/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/30/2011.(wjc, )
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time and denying 53 Motion to Compel. For further information, please see attached minutes. (FTR: Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/13/10. (mnf, )
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 1/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/22/2010. (wjc, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Rule 16 Hearing set for 2/14/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/21/10. (msksec, )
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/2/10. (mskcd)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/21/2010 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/25/2010. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asher v. Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall S. Asher
Represented By: Erik G. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?