Hall v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Claudia E. Hall
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2010cv01565
Filed: July 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Motion for Dismissa 12 is GRANTED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/04/2011 is VACATED. The trial to court set for 11/07/2011 is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/08/2010. (sah, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/16/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/4/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Bench Trial set for 11/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/16/2010 at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/8/10. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia E. Hall
Represented By: Barry Ira Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?