HealthOne of Denver, Inc. et al v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Plaintiff: HealthOne of Denver, Inc. and HCA-HealthOne LLC
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2010cv01633
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER. ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of all Claims 199 is APPROVED and this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/24/12. (sgrim)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Vacate Court Deadlines and Stay Proceedings 197 is GRANTED and all case-related deadlines in this case are VACATED. ORDERED that this case is stayed until September 7, 2012, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/10/12.(sgrim)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MINUTE ORDER granting 193 Motion to Stay Until 07/02/12. The parties shall either file a joint status report or the pre-trial motions and response briefs that currently are due on June 22, 2012 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/13/12.(jjhsl, )
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER on Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 52 is GRANTED as to the claim asserted under the Colorado Consumer Protection Act and DENIED in all other respects by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/30/12.(jjhsl, )
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER granting 158 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits in HealthONE's Response to Uniteds Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/24/12.(jjhsl, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: denying 154 Motion to Stay; Discovery due by 3/13/2012. HealthONE shall respond to UnitedHealths Motion for Summary Judgment on or before March 13, 2012; and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/17/12.(bnbcd, )
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant UnitedHealth Group Incorporated=s Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Kenneth B. Germain and for Filing Under Seal 56 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART consistent with this Order. The request to prohibit public access to Mr. Germain=s report is also GRANTED. Mr. Germain's report will be restricted to public access at Level One. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2.B by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/12/12.(jjh, )
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Denial of Its 116 Motion for Protective Order is OVERRULED, and the 109 Order of Magistrate Judge Boland is AFFIRMED. Defendant's 141 Motion to the District Judge for Stay of Plaintiffs' Optum-Related Discovery Pending Appeal to the District Judge is DENIED AS MOOT, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/21/2011.(wjc, )
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER. Order granting 117 Motion for Discovery. Order denying 121 Motion to Stay. Order granting 132 Motion to Reply. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Defendant's Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/07/11.(jjh, )
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE ORDER granting 131 Motion for Leave to File Summary Judgment Brief Exceeding 15 Pages by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/03/11.(jjh, )
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion to Strike New Arguments and Mischaracterized Facts in Defendants Reply, or, Alternatively, for Leave to File Surreply by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/24/11.(jjh, )
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. The Motion for Entry of Protective Order 91 is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Licenses 94 is DENIED; The Motion to Clarify 100 is GRANTED to specify that the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of UnitedHealth may occur in its entirety at a date and time as the parties may agree provided that it is completed on or before 12/21/2011; The Motion for Extension 103 is GRANTED to allow the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of G2 Direct & Digital to occur at a date and time as the parties and the deponent may agree provided that it is completed on or before 12/21/2011; and (5) Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal 104 is GRANTED, and Doc. # 102-4 shall remain sealed, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/22/11. (lsw, )
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER : re: Granting 81 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order filed by HealthOne of Denver, Inc., HCA-HealthOne LLC,. Granting 77 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to make Discovery and to Limit Discovery filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Discovery due by 12/21/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/27/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/29/11. (bnbcd, )
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Compel. The defendant shall make a supplemental discovery response consistent with this order on or before August 1, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/11.(bnbcd, )
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: granting 54 Motion to increase depositions; granting 61 Motion to Amend scheduling order. The rebuttal expert report of Basil Englis, and all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) in connection with that rebuttal report, shall be provided to the defendant on or before August 16, 2011 Discovery due by 9/6/2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/30/11.(bnbcd, )
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Ordered that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Colorado Consumer Protection Claims and Common Law Unfair Competition Claim Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) 22 is Denied by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/28/11.(jjh, )
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: granting 47 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Expert Report Deadlines. Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Expert Witness Disclosures: The plaintiff shall designate all experts and provide opposing co unsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before March 31, 2011; The defendant shall designate all experts and rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before May 2, 2011; The plaintiff shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before May 23, 2011; Discovery due by 6/13/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/20 11. Section 9 (e) preliminary list of depositions Prior to June 13, 2011; Jo Ann Sporleder, Michael Corne Krysta Moody, UnitedHealth Group Experts: May 29, 2011-June 29, 2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2011. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/15/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/11.(bnbcd, )
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/20/11. (bnbcd, )
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: granting 40 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to AmendScheduling Order. Expert Witness Disclosures:The plaintiff shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or befor e March 3, 2011; The defendant shall designate all experts and rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before April 4, 2011; The plaintiff shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before April 25, 2011; Discovery due by 5/16/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2011. Section 9 (e) preliminary list of depositions Prior to May 16, 2011 Jo Ann Sporleder, Michael Corne Krysta Moody Experts: May 1, 2011-June 1, 2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/6/10.(bnbcd, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting : 28 Defendant UnitedHealth Group IncorporatedsUnopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Any out-of-state counsel may appearat the Scheduling Conference telephonically at the appropr iate date and time by calling Chambers at 303/844-6408. If more than just defense counsel will be calling, a conference call will need to be arranged between the parties so only one call to Chambers will be in-coming, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/13/10.(bnbcd, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/4/10. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HealthOne of Denver, Inc. et al v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HealthOne of Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Erin McAlpin Eiselein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCA-HealthOne LLC
Represented By: Erin McAlpin Eiselein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?