Dittmer v. Deutsche Bank National Trust
Plaintiff: Stevan Dittmer
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Case Number: 1:2010cv01832
Filed: August 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party shall pay its own costs and attorneys' fees. by Judge David M. Ebel on 8/8/2011. (erv, )
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Plaintiffs motions [ 10] and 11 are DENIED. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to show cause as to why this action should not be dismissed in light of those doctrines by filing, within fourteen days, a memorandum explaining why this action does not run afoul of those doctrines. By Judge David M. Ebel on 08/11/2010.(sah, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 11/4/2010 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/09/2010. (sah, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Plaintiffs Petition for Restraining Order 2 and Petition for Temporary Injunction 4 are hereby DENIED without prejudice. By Judge David M. Ebel on 08/04/2010.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dittmer v. Deutsche Bank National Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevan Dittmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?