Hardy v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Marcus E. Hardy
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv01880
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 91 is APPROVED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/18/2011. (sah, )
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion In Limine To Exclude Assumption of Risk Evidence and Argument and Supporting Brief 44 filed 10/4/2011, is DENIED without prejudice. The Plaintiffs Motion In Limine To Deny Defendants Request ToApportion Damages Based on Al leged Non-Railroad Causes and Supporting Brief 45 filed 10/4/2011, is DENIED. The Plaintiffs Motion In Limine To Exclude Genetics Testimony and Argument and Supporting Brief 47 filed 10/4/2011, is DENIED. The Plaintiffs Motion In Limine To Exclude Collateral Source Evidence and Supporting Brief 52 filed 10/6/2011, is DENIED without prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/4/2011.(sah, )
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER. Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Untimely Responses To Defendants Motions In Limine 65 filed 10/25/2011, is GRANTED in part. The plaintiffs responses 59 , 61 to the defendants motions in limine 35 , 38 are STRICKEN because they were not filed timely. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/3/2011.(sah, )
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. Union Pacific Railroad Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Inadmissible Expert Testimony of Tyler Kress, Ph.D. 39 filed 9/8/2011 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/2/2011.(sah, )
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion Re: Glossary of Railroad Terminology For Trial Pursuant To Civil Practice Standards (III)(I) 75 is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/1/2011.(sah, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Companys First General Motion In Limine 35 filed 9/8/2011, is DENIED without prejudice. Union Pacific Railroad Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Inadmissible Documents Identified by Plaintiff As Proposed Trial Exhibits 38 filed 9/8/2011, is DENIED without prejudice. Union Pacific Railroad Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Inadmissible Documents Identified by Plaintiff As Proposed Trial Exhibits 38 filed 9/8/2011, is DENIED without prejudice. Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Companys Moiton In Limine and Memorandum To Strike Nondisclosed Witnesses From Trial, or, In the Alternative, To Exclude Duplicative and Excessive Witnesses 36 filed 9/8/2011, is DENIED without prejudice to the exte nt the defendant argues that the testimony of the three witnesses specified in the motion is duplicative and excessive. On or before 11/1/2011, the defendant SHALL FILE a reply addressing the plaintiffs argument that the testimony of Wayne Reese should be admitted despite the tardy disclosure of this witness. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/27/2011.(sah, )
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Defendants Motion Requesting Permission To Bring Audio-Visual and Cell Phones/Blackbery(ies) Into Courthouse During Trial Pursuant To Civil Practice Standards (III)(H) 64 filed 10/24/2011, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/25/2011.(sah, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER. On or before Friday, 10/7/2011, plaintiff shall file a certificate of service pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1.G for documents 44 , 45 , and 47 . On or before Friday, 10/7/2011, plaintiff shall file a certificate of compliance pursuan t to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1.A for documents 44], 45 , and 47 . Plaintiffs Motion in Limine To Exclude Collateral Source Evidence and Supporting Brief 46 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with this courts practice standard, REB Civ. Practice Standard V.B.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/5/2011.(sah2, )
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/29/2011. Defendant's Oral Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Transfer is granted; Withdrawing 7 Defendant' s Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404. Parties shall re-submit a Final Pretrial Order in its final form for the Court's signature on or before 7/13/2011, nunc pro tunc to 6/29/2011. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/21/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 11/7/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2010. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus E. Hardy
Represented By: Fredric A. Bremseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?