Christie v. Loomis Armored US, Inc.

Plaintiff: Theresa Christie
Defendant: Loomis Armored US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv02011
Filed: August 20, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Parties Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. This matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay her or its own attorneys fees and costs. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Review of Costs Taxed 118 and the Motion to Stay Costs 119 are DENIED as MOOT, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/11/2013.(ervsl, )
July 8, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant on Plaintiffs claims brought under the ADEA, ADA, and Title VII (Claims 1-5); Plaintiffs claims for violation of the Colorado Anti-Discrimination Act (Claim 6) and Wrongful Discharge in Violation of Public Policy (Claim 7) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant shall have its costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/8/2013.(ervsl, )
July 27, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/27/2012. (kmtcd)
June 19, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2012 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/2012. (kmtcd)
June 13, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/13/2012. (kmtcd)
December 9, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs Objection 24 , to the Magistrate Judges Recommendation is SUSTAINED; Rejecting 21 Report and Recommendations of the The Magistrate, on the grounds first raised by the Plaintiff in her objection; Denying 8 Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration; The Magistrate Judge shall promptly set this matter for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.1. by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/9/2011.(ervsl, )
February 16, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before 2/25/2011, a Joint Status Report. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2011. (sah, )
August 26, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/26/10. (ebs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christie v. Loomis Armored US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Christie
Represented By: Catherine A. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loomis Armored US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?