Martinez v. City and County of Denver, The et al
Plaintiff: Gema Martinez
Defendant: City and County of Denver, The, Michael Gabriel and Michael (I) Gabriel
Case Number: 1:2010cv02079
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/10/2013. (cmacd)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Early Neutral Evaluation and Settlement Conference set for 7/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/7/2013. (mjwcd)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Motions in Limine, and granting 81 Fourth Motion in Limine, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/5/13.(dkals, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/15/2012.(jjpsl, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 66 Motion to Modify Pretrial Order and Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/4/2012.(jjpsl, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/18/12.(jjpsl, )
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions to and Including August 1, 2011. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2011. Final Pretrial Conference 7/26/2011 08:30 AM is vacated; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/26/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/19/2011.(mjwcd)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Defendant Police Officers' Depositions at the Federal Courthouse, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/16/2011.(mjwcd)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 12 is modified. Discovery due by 6/17/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/3/2011.(mjwcd)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint. First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand [17-1] is accepted for filing, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/21/2011.(mjwcd)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/3/2011. (mjwcd)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/22/2010. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. City and County of Denver, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gema Martinez
Represented By: Sara J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?