Allen v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: Shawn D. Allen
Defendant: N. Allen, N. (I) Allen, C. Flory, C. (I) Flory, A. Cosner, A. (I) Cosner, K. Nordell, K. (I) Nordell, A. Medina, A. (I) Medina, K. Sokol, K. (I) Sokol, C. Tuttle and C. (I) Tuttle
Case Number: 1:2010cv02207
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER AFFIRMING 127 APRIL 17, 2012 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Defendants' 96 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/9/12.(mnfsl, )
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER : DENYING 109 Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/13/2012.(mjwcd)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER denying 98 Motion to Compel Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/21/11.(jjpsl, )
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER granting 95 Defendants' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' 96 Motion for Summary Judgment is accepted as filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/30/11.(mnfsl, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER denying 77 plaintiffs Motion to Have Defendants [sic]Ordered to Provide Plaintiff Recording of Any Deposition Taken by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/4/2011.(erv, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting 84 Defendants Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Discovery by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/30/2011.(erv, )
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 60 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge; Overruled OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 51 Order on Motion for Order by Plaintiff Shawn D. Allen. granting 72 Motion to Withdraw Document 54 ; withdrawing 48 Motion for TRO; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/8/2011.(erv, )
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Defendants Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants First Set of Discovery. It is thus further ORDERED that on or before August 17, 2011, plaintiff shall fully respond to the Defendants First Set of Discovery to Plaintiff Shawn D. Allen Docket No. [57-1]. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/3/2011.(erv, )
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Order to Allow Deposition of Plaintiff Shawn Allen Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(a)(2) by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/26/2011.(erv, )
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Be Provided a Copy of Plaintiffs Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/2/2011.(erv, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 3/8/2011.Granting 32 Defendants' Motion to Vacate Proposed Scheduling Order. Granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Claim for Relief. Discovery due by 10/14/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2011. (mjwcd)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion to Slightly Amend Complaint. Defamation claim against Cosner is dismissed without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/9/10.(mnf, )
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Have Defendant K. Nordell Ordered to Provide Me Reasonable Access to Law Library, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/16/2010.(mjwcd)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Amend Request for Relief. Request for Relief, is added as the last page of the Prisoner Complaint 3 as an addition to section G, Request for Relief. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/6/2010.(erv, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 3 Complaint, filed by Shawn D. Allen by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/21/2010. (erv, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. This case shall be assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., nad to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/15/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. (I) Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Flory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. (I) Flory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Cosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. (I) Cosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Nordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. (I) Nordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. (I) Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. (I) Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. (I) Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?