Kemper v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gary Allen Kemper
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2010cv02237
Filed: September 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. ORDERED that the "motion to attach to new case" 43 and the request in Plaintiff's letter filed August 24, 2012 44 are DENIED, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/25/12.(sgrim)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion 34 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that this case is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the Commissioner for further factfinding pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). A new ALJ is to be appointed, and that ALJ is instructed to find that Plaintiff has met his burden at steps one and two and to proceed to subsequent steps in the sequential evaluation by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/14/12.(jjhsl, )
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion to Cite Supplemental Authority, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/18/11.(gmssl, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/12/2011. SS Defendants Brief due by 9/12/2011. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/28/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/15/11. (gmssl, )
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Motion to Reopen Case. Civil action is reopened for review by the Court, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/24/11.(gmssl, )
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Motion to Remand. Civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge John L. Kane on 11/18/10.(gmssl, )
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/22/10. (gmssl, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Drawing Case. Case shall be placed on the AP Docket, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/21/10. (gmssl, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff instructed to submit a corrected 1915 Motion, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/10/10. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemper v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Allen Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?