Dumpert et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ralph Dumpert and Deborah Dumpert
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv02320
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/14/2012. (rpmcd )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference and Trial Date. Jury Trial set for 11/26/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2012 02:00 PM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2012 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 05/16/12. (jjhsl, )
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 5/16/2012 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012 and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/2/2012. (rpmcd )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRE-TRIAL RULINGS, (see Order for details), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/30/2012. Motion 28 terminated: as ruled on. (rpmcd)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 8/2/2011 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed pretrial order due by 4:00 p.m. 7/25/2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/1/2011. (rpmcd)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Dismissing Second and Third Claims for Relief. Ordered that the motion for sanctions under the local rule 18 is denied. ORDERED that a pretrial conference will now be convened on the remaining claim for benefits up to the State Farm policy limits of $100,000 by proving damages exceeding the $1.1 million dollars coverage under the American Family Insurance policy by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/29/11.(jjh, )
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Vacating Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 14, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. and the June 9, 2011 deadline to submit a proposed pretrial order re: 17 , 18 and 19 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/31/2011. (rpmcd)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/15/2011.(rpmcd)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to compel discovery 7 and the plaintiffs motion for extension of time 10 are denied by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/08/11.(jjh, )
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/17/2010 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 10, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/22/2010. (rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumpert et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Dumpert
Represented By: Richard M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Dumpert
Represented By: Richard M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather E. Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?