Bonidy et al v. United States Postal Service et al

Plaintiff: Debbie Bonidy, Tab Bonidy and National Association for Gun Rights
Defendant: United States Postal Service, John Potter and Steve Ruehle
Case Number: 1:2010cv02408
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 39:409
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk Pursuant to the Order Amending Final Judgment entered by Senior District Judge Richard P. Matsch on September 17, 2015, the claims of unconstitutionality of 39 C.F.R. § 232.1(l) made by Plaintiffs are denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/17/15. (ktera)
July 9, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk and Approved by Court re 44 : the Defendants take such action as is necessary to permit Tab Bonidy to use the public parking lot adjacent to the Avon Post Office Building with a firearm authorized by his Concealed Carry Permit se cured in his car in a reasonably prescribed manner.The other claims of unconstitutionality of 39 C.F.R. § 232.1(l) made by Plaintiffs are denied. Plaintiffs Tad Bonidy and the National Association for Gun Rights shall have their costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of the Court within 14 days of entry of judgment, by Clerk on 7/9/2013. (rpmcd )
June 18, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 33 , is taken under advisement and a written opinion will be entered. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 31 , is taken under advisement and a written opinion will be entered. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
September 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF DEBBIE BONIDY'S CLAIMS AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE and each party will bear its own costs and attorney's fees with respect to Ms. Bonidys claims re: 29 Stipulation, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/5/2012. (Debbie Bonidy terminated), (rpmcd)
April 6, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 27 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/6/2012. (rpmcd )
November 18, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 19, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/18/2011. (rpmcd)
March 21, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2011 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed December 6, 2010 6 , is granted with leave for plaintiffs to file an amended complaint (20 days) by April 11, 2011. (FTR: K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonidy et al v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Bonidy
Represented By: James M. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tab Bonidy
Represented By: James M. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for Gun Rights
Represented By: James M. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Ruehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?