Mallory v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Mallory
Defendant: Susan Jones, Pamela J. Ploughe, Aristedes W. Zavaras, Cheryl Smith, Ladeau, Wright, Josi Edwards, Barbara Ferguson, Neal Lousberg and Joanie Shoemaker
Case Number: 1:2010cv02564
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 128 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Civil Case Terminated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/30/13. (alvsl)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/4/2012. (kmtcd)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A five-day Jury Trial is set for November 5, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for October 19, 2012 at 1:00 p.m. Please see the order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/16/2011. (rbjsec. )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Deadline. Discovery due by 1/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset to 5/16/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/11.(lsw, )
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline for Expert Disclosures now due November 7, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/26/2011.(erv, )
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 5/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/9/2011. (erv, )
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 12 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claim against Defendants Roger Cissel and Ashley Bennaly are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and, therefore, Defendants Cissel and Bennaly are DISMISSED from this action. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 is DENIED IN PART with respect to Plaintiff's claim against: Defendants Sergeant Johnson, Sergeant Panek, David Ladeau, Lieutenant Cella, Dr. Wermers, Neal Lousberg, Susan Jones, Pamela J. Ploughe, Arist edes W. Zavaras, Cheryl Smith, and Joanie Shoemaker. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 is GRANTED IN PART with respect to Plaintiff's claim Against: Defendants Dr. Joseph Wright, Josi Edwards, and Kathleen Abel, therefore, Plaintiff's claims against these individuals are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and these individuals are DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiff's release on parole renders moot his request for declaratory relief, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/3/11.(lsw, )
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Defendants' 19 Motion to Stay Discovery and granting Defendants' 19 Motion for Protective Order. All discovery is Stayed. The deadlines set in the Scheduling Order 17 are vacated, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/6/11.(lsw, )
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 9/12/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/18/2011. (erv, )
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/26/2010. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallory v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Mallory
Represented By: Brittany L. Glidden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J. Ploughe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes W. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josi Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Lousberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanie Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?