Tremethick v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Tremethick
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange and Farmers Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv02592
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2013. (rpmcd)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 54 : the trial preparation conference set for August 30, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. and the trial set for September 23, 2013 are vacated. Dismissal Paper due by 9/20/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/27/2013. (rpmcd)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 9/23/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and Trial Preparation Conference for 8/30/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/15/2013. (rpmcd)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/11/2013 03:00 PM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 4, 2013 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/12/13. (jjhsl, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment and this matter will be set for a pretrial conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/7/2013.(rpmcd )
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Farmers Group, Inc. 21 . Each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to any claims related to or made against Farmers Group Inc. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/24/11. (jjh, )
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Amended Order 17 / 16 Order (corrects date signed), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/1/2011. (rpmcd )
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/22/2011 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 17, 2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/4/2011. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tremethick v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Tremethick
Represented By: James Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Thomas P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?