Jackson v. Shinseik et al
Plaintiff: David Jackson
Defendant: Eric Ken Shinseik and Lynette A. Roff
Case Number: 1:2010cv02596
Filed: October 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 11/29/2011. Denying 91 Motion to Redact 89 Transcript. Denying without prejudice 97 Motion for Order. (FTR: Emily Seamon) (eseam)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Motion Hearing was held on 5/11/2011. ORDERED: The Emergency Motion to Effectuate Service, doc # 57 is DENIED AS MOOT. Discovery will remain STAYED pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, doc # 51 . By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 USCA ORDER re: 58 Letter as to petition for writ of mandamus filed in the 10th Circuit Court of Appeals. The petition is denied and the motion for in forma pauperis is also denied. USCA case no. 11-1167. (bjrsl, )
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Preliminary Scheduling Conference was held on 2/7/2011. ORDERED: The Motion for Disclosure, doc # 14 is DENIED. Discovery is STAYED pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, doc # 42 . Plaintiff may file written objections to these rulings within 14 days. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 28 Amended Motion to Compel; denying 30 Motion and Notice for Leave to File Amended Pleading by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/16/2010.(cbscd)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/12/10. (mskcd)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/04/2010. (wjc, )
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/02/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Shinseik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ken Shinseik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette A. Roff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?