International Paper Company v. Rowland
Plaintiff: International Paper Company
Defendant: Shawn Rowland
Case Number: 1:2010cv02645
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/4/2011.(erv, )
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Joint Motion to Continue Limited Stay of Discovery up to and including July 15, 2011 to continue with limited discovery and settlement discussions in hopes of resolving this matter. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/11/2011.(erv, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/15/2011. (mjwcd)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Stipulated Motion for Limited Stay of Discovery. That on or before June 30, 2011, the parties shall either file a Notice of Settlement or Status Report. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/6/2011.(erv, )
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 22 Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/21/2011.(erv, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before 2/28/2011, a Joint Status Report. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/18/2011. (sah, )
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/7/2010. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Paper Company v. Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Paper Company
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?