Turley v. Mink et al
Plaintiff: Robert Turley
Defendant: Ted B. Mink, Correctional Healthcare Management, Inc., Kelly Jean Dryke and Matt Killough
Case Number: 1:2010cv02772
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation to Dismiss All Claims Against All Defendants 57 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/20/2012 is VACATED. The jury trial set for 1/23/2012 is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/16/2011. (sah, )
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER of Recusal, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/3/11. (gmssl, )
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 34 Renewed Unopposed Motion for Rule 35 Examination and for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum. The Renewed Motion is GRANTED IN PART to allow the independent medical examination to be conducted, and DENIED IN PART insofar as it seeks a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/2011.(bnbcd, )
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER :granting 24 Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/2/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2011. The plaintiff shall designate all experts and provide opposingcounsel with all information specified in Fed. R . Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before July 3, 2011 The defendants shall designate all experts and rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before August 2, 2011 The plaintiff shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before September 1, 2011; and No further extensions will be allowed, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/19/11.(bnbcd, )
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: granting 19 Defendant Correctional Health Care Management, Inc., Kelly Jean Dryke, R.N., and Matt Killough, P.A.s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Depose Prisoner and may take the deposition of plaintiff at Kit Carson Correctional Facility or at such prison or correctional facility where Mr. Turley is incarcerated on the date of the deposition, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/10/11.(bnbcd, )
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/6/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Six (6) day Jury Trial set for 1/23/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/2/11. (rebsec, )
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Sheriff Ted B. Mink 5 filed 1/19/2011, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, Sheriff Ted B. Mink, are DISMISSED. Defendant, Sheriff Ted B. Mink, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/19/2011. (sah, )
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/23/10. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turley v. Mink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Turley
Represented By: Brice A. Tondre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted B. Mink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Healthcare Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Jean Dryke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Killough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?