USA v. 2007 Monaco M-40PDQ Motor Home VIN 1RF43464X72043536 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2007 Monaco M-40PDQ Motor Home VIN 1RF43464X72043536, 2005 Optima Utility Trailer VIN 5MVWB24255E001500, $104,800.00 United States Currency, $83,000.00 United States Currency and $4,725.00 United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2010cv02855
Filed: November 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against the Defendant Property re: 66 Order, by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 10/11/12. (alvsl)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE re: 65 Unopposed MOTION for Forfeiture of Property filed by USA. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a forfeiture of defendant property shall enter in favor of the United States; the United States shall have full and legal title to the defendant property, and may dispose of it in accordance with law and in accordance with the terms and provisions of the parties Settlement Agreement; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment, and a Certificate of Reasonable Cause, which this Order constitutes, is GRANTED as to all defendant property pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465. Civil Case Terminated. By Judge William J. Martinez on 10/09/12. (alvsl)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2012, granting 53 Motion for Order. Discovery due by 8/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 9/20/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (FTR: Courtroom C-201) (kmtcd)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/20/2011. (kmtcd)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 23 Claimant Ronald Keller's Motion to Stay Proceedings. This case is stayed as to Claimant Ronald Keller, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 981(g)(2), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/3/11.(mnf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2007 Monaco M-40PDQ Motor Home VIN 1RF43464X72043536 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Monaco M-40PDQ Motor Home VIN 1RF43464X72043536
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2005 Optima Utility Trailer VIN 5MVWB24255E001500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $104,800.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $83,000.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,725.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?