Felipe et al v. Boeing Company, Inc., The et al
Plaintiff: Albert Felipe and Meagan Felipe
Defendant: Boeing Company, Inc., The, BE Aerospace, Inc. and Burns Aerospace Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv03051
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER of DISMISSAL (This Order Relates to Civil Action No. 10-cv-03051-REB-BNB). The Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice [# 275 ] is APPROVED. 10-cv-03051-REB-BNB is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs. Any pending motion filed in Civil Action 10-cv-03051-REB-BNB, isDENIED as moot. 10-cv-03051-REB-BNB SHALL NOT APPEAR in the captionof this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/25/2013. (klyon, )
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. The parties Unopposed Motion To Consolidate 15 filed 1/31/2011, is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No.10-cv-03051-CMA-BNB is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No.10-cv-03050-REB-BNB for all purposes. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/2/2011. (sah, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/28/11. (mnf, )
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/27/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felipe et al v. Boeing Company, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Felipe
Represented By: Patricia M. Jarzobski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Felipe
Represented By: Patricia M. Jarzobski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BE Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns Aerospace Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?