Lopez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Cathryn M. Lopez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2010cv03169
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on 30 Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406 (b). The plaintiff, Cathryn M. Lopez, on behalf of her attorney, Frederick W. Newall, is entitled to an award of fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) in the amount of $10,874.25. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/02/2015. (athom, )
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES UNDER EAJA by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/25/14. (jdyne, )
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REMANDING CASE The ALJs decision is reversed and this case is remanded for an award of benefits, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/2/2013. (ervsl, )
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/26/2011. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/27/2011. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/11/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/15/2011. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathryn M. Lopez
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Debra J. Meachum
Represented By: William George Pharo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?