Righthaven LLC v. Rozzell

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: David Rozzell
Case Number: 1:2011cv00133
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER The parties have stipulated to a dismissal of this action, with prejudice. Although they cite Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), their stipulation is effective under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, the parties stipulation took effect upon filing and requires no court order. Per the terms of their stipulation, this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/9/2011. (ervsl, )
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. This case is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss in Civil Case Number 1:11-cv-00830, by Judge John L. Kane on 05/19/2011. (wjc, )
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 4/7/2011 at 10:00 a.m. A Proposed Scheduling Order, as well as Confidential Settlement Statements, are due no later than 5:00 p.m. on 3/31/11, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/1/11. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Rozzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Steven George Ganim
Represented By: Shawn Anthony Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rozzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?