Righthaven LLC v. Hill

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Brian D. Hill
Case Number: 1:2011cv00211
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. Mr. Hill's 12 Motion for Attorney Fees is denied. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/9/11.(mnfsl, )
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Response to Defendant's Reply in Support of His Motion for Attorney Fees. The hearing set for 05/27/2011 is VACATED, by Judge John L. Kane on 05/25/2011.(wjc, )
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: 17 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(f), those portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal which are immaterial and impertinent, namely all text following Plaintiff's statement that the notice closes the file for this case, are STRICKEN, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/11/11. (lsw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Shawn Anthony Mangano
Represented By: Steven George Ganim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Hill
Represented By: David Stevens Kerr
Represented By: Luke Robert Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?