Righthaven LLC v. Death and Taxes Media, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Death and Taxes Media, LLC, Joe Weber and Stephen Blackwell
Case Number: 1:2011cv00221
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER. This case is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss in Civil Case Number 1:11-cv-00830, by Judge John L. Kane on 05/19/2011. (wjc, )
April 5, 2011 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC.. (Ganim, Steven)
March 22, 2011 12 Docket Annotation re: 8 Summons Returned Executed. Modified on 3/22/2011 to edit served and answer due dates. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
March 18, 2011 11 Docket Annotation re: 9 Summons Returned Executed. Modified on 3/18/2011 to add text name of party served, served on date and answer due date. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
March 18, 2011 10 Docket Annotation re: 8 Summons Returned Executed. Modified on 3/18/2011 to correct name of party served. Counsel notified this document was filed in this case in error. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
March 17, 2011 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. Stephen Blackwell served on 2/17/2011, answer due 3/10/2011. (Ganim, Steven) Modified on 3/18/2011 to add text name of party served, served on date and answer due date (wjc, ).
March 17, 2011 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. Eric C. Dolan served on 2/27/2011, answer due 3/21/2011. (Ganim, Steven) Modified on 3/18/2011 to correct name of party served (wjc, ). Modified on 3/22/2011 to correct served and answer due dates (wjc, ).
March 9, 2011 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. Death and Taxes Media, LLC served on 2/18/2011, answer due 3/11/2011. (Ganim, Steven)
February 28, 2011 6 STATUS REPORT Proposed Plan by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Ganim, Steven)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order 5 MINUTE ORDER. The 3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge is VACATED as are any previously scheduled court dates and hearings. Status Report due by 2/28/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 02/14/2011. (wjc, )
February 14, 2011 4 REASSIGNING JUDGE. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR40.1A., this case is reassigned to Judge John L. Kane. All future pleadings should reference Judge Kane's initials at the end of the case number (such as 11-cv-00001-JLK). TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wjc, )
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, for non-dispositive matters, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/28/11. (rebsec, )
January 27, 2011 2 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (lyg, )
January 27, 2011 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Stephen Blackwell, Death and Taxes Media, LLC, and Joe Weber (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 34781) Summons Issued, filed by Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Receipt)(lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Death and Taxes Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Steven George Ganim
Represented By: Shawn Anthony Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Death and Taxes Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?