Roosevelt-Hennix v. City of Florence, The et al
Plaintiff: Lara Roosevelt-Hennix
Defendant: City of Florence, The, Shane (I) Prickett, Shane Prickett, James (I) Barr and James Barr
Case Number: 1:2011cv00353
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party is to bear their own attorney fees and costs as agreed between the parties, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/8/2013. (rpmcd)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 11/18/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/3/2013. (rpmcd )
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Regarding 39 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate : deadline for the Parties to submit a Pretrial Order (August 16, 201)) and the Pretrial Conference set for August 23, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. are vacated re 30 , and these requirements are held in abeyance pending the resolution of the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals case no. 12-1307, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/15/2012.(rpmcd)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Amend 29 Judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/18/2012. 33 moot.(rpmcd)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 8/23/2012 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, lead counsel present in person and proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/1/2012. (rpmcd )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2012 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 18 , is granted with respect to the Second Cause of Action (Excessive Force) against defendant Barr, Third Cause of Action (Deprivation of Constitutional Right) against City of Florence and Fourth Cause of Action (Assault and Vicarious Liability) against all defendants and denied with respect to the First Cause of Action (Excessive Force) against defenda nt Prickett. Defendants Barr and City of Florence are dismissed and case will proceed against defendant Prickett in his individual capacity on plaintiffs First Cause of Action. (FTR: B. Abiakam). City of Florence, The (a municipal corporation), Shane Prickett (Officer, in his official capacity), James Barr (Officer, in his official capacity) and James (I) Barr (in his individual capacity) terminated. (rpmcd)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Amend re 7 , Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/20/2012.(rpmcd)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Amend 7 Scheduling Order. The discovery cut-off is extended to January 10, 2012, for the sole purpose of permitting Defendants to take the depositions of Dr. Saathoff, Dr. Murad, and Dr. Roberts, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/19/2011.(rpmcd)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Amend 7 Scheduling Order. Deadline for contradicting expert witness disclosures is extended to October 28, 2011, and the deadline for rebuttal expert witness disclosures isextended to November 11, 2011. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/11/2011.(rpmcd)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/7/2011. (rpmcd )
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/14/2011 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on June 9, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/13/2011. (rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roosevelt-Hennix v. City of Florence, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Roosevelt-Hennix
Represented By: Terry Ernest Rector
Represented By: L. Daniel Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Florence, The
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane (I) Prickett
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Prickett
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McCutcheon
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Barr
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McCutcheon
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Barr
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McCutcheon
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?