Jones v. David's Bridal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mohanee Jones
Defendant: David's Bridal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00358
Filed: February 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 15 is GRANTED. Defendant is entitled to summary judgment in its favor as to all of Plaintiff's claims alleging race and national origin discrimination under Title VII. This mat ter is DISMISSED in its entirety. ORDERED that the trial set for Monday, October 15, 2012 and the final trial preparation conference set for Wednesday, October 3, 2012 are hereby VACATED. ORDERED that in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, Defendant shall have its costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen days of entry of judgment by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/08/12.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 8/8/2012 (jjhsl, ).
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/11.(jjh, )
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/16/11. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions for Scheduling Order Preparation, # 2 Attchment 2, # 3 Attachment 3)(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. David's Bridal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohanee Jones
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David's Bridal, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?