Cortez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Dominique Cortez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv00398
Filed: February 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of Dismissal Granting 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Case is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/24/11.(gmssl, )
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw (and Replace) Social Security Administrative Record. Corrected electronic Certified Administrative Record submitted as Attachments 2-16 with the Unopposed Motion is ACCEPTED as filed, re: 9 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/1/11.(gmssl, )
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/5/2011. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/4/2011. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/19/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/24/11. (gmssl, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 filed by Dominique Cortez, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/18/11. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: William George Pharo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Cortez
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?