Starks v. CSL Plasma Centers
Plaintiff: Victoria L. Starks
Defendant: CSL Plasma Centers
Case Number: 1:2011cv00401
Filed: February 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 20 , filed 6/28/2011, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Plaintiffs claims in this case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) for failure to comply with duly issued orders of t he court and failure to prosecute, as detailed fully in the magistrate judges recommendation. Defendant CSL Plasma Inc.s Partial Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) 13 , filed 5/6/2011, is DENIED AS MOOT. Judgment SHALL ENTER on be half of defendant, CSL Plasma, Inc., misnamed in the caption as CSL Plasma Centers, and against plaintiff, Victoria L. Starks, as to all claims and causes of action asserted herein; provided, that judgment as to these defendants SHALL BE with prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/2011.(sah, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Service By United States Marshal. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Process Receipt and Return)(sah, )
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/3/2011. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starks v. CSL Plasma Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria L. Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Plasma Centers
Represented By: Stacy Dian Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?