Arakawa v. Carestream Health, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jody L. Arakawa
Defendant: Carestream Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00653
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: 18 . Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted and the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this civil action with an award of costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/15/2012. (rpmcd)
December 12, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 1/26/2012 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 1/19/2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/12/2011. (rpmcd )
November 16, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 13 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/16/2011. (rpmcd)
May 4, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Vacate May 19, 2011, SchedulingConference and resetting it for 5/24/2011 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed scheduling order in paper form directly to chambers no later than 4:00 p.m. on May 19, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/4/2011.(rpmcd)
April 22, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/19/2011 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 12, 2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/22/2011. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arakawa v. Carestream Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody L. Arakawa
Represented By: Hannah Bell Ross
Represented By: Mark Joseph Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carestream Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kalisha S. Chorba
Represented By: Christopher Marshall Leh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?