Nova Leasing, LLC v. Sun River Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nova Leasing, LLC
Defendant: Mountain Share Transfer, Inc. and Sun River Energy, Inc.
Cross_claimant: Mountain Share Transfer, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Sun River Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00689
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF No. 237 ). It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. This action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its/his own fees and costs. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/05/13. (alvsl)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 231 Motion to Quash/Modify Subpoena. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/13 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/3/13.(bnbcd, )
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER denying as moot 175 Renewed, Partial Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant Sun River Energy, Inc.'s Counterclaims against Plaintiff Nova Leasing, LLC. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/12/13. (alvsl)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice re: 218 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Sun River Energy, Inc. by Nova Leasing, LLC, are dismissed with prejudice; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all counterclaims against Nova Leasing, LLC by Sun River Energy, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all cross-claims of Sun River Energy Inc. against Michael Littman are dismissed with prejudice. No other claims by or against any other parties to this action are dismissed herein and all such claims remain pending, including without limitation Nova Leasing, LLC's claims against Defendants Harry McMillan, Cicerone Corporate Development, LLC and J.H. Brech, LLC. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 05/30/13. (alvsl)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 192 Motion for Attorney Fees. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/28/13.(bnbcd, )
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER: The Motion to Quash 171 is DENIED as moot, the Pingel subpoena having been withdrawn. The Motion to Compel 182 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. Supplemental discovery responses due by 3/25/13. Status conference set for 3/28/13 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/13/13. (bnbcd, )
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: 159 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED, 160 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Absent appearance of substitute counsel within 21 days of the date of this order, pleadings, motions, and other papers may be stricken, and default judgment or other sanctions may be imposed against Cicerone and J.H. Brech. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/18/13. (bnbcd, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/18/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, to set a date by which a response to the Partial Motion for Summary Judgment 125 shall be due. Counsel may appear by telephone. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/8/13. (bnbcd, )
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re: 130 MOTION to Continue Nova's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d) filed by Sun River Energy, Inc is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/12 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A401 Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 10/24/12. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/15/12. (bnbcd, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 76 Motion to Dismiss and 77 Motion to Dismiss. 71 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. The caption on all subsequent filings shall reflect the proper parties. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/31/12.(dkals, )
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MOUNTAIN SHARE TRANSFER, INC. AND CROSS-CLAIM DEFENDANT SUN RIVER ENERGY, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE re: 126 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Mountain Share Transfer and Cross-Claim Defendant Sun River Energy. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/21/12.(mnfsl, )
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: granting 116 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order, Pre-Trial Conference and Pre-Trial Order Deadlines. Status Report due by 5/31/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/27/12.(bnbcd, )
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Denying 40 Motion to Dismiss Mountain Share's Cross-Claim; denying 56 Motion to Dismiss Nova's Second Amended Complaint, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/28/2012.(jjpsl, ) Modified on 3/29/2012 to modify text (jjpsl, ).
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying without prejudice 69 Motion for Sanctions and Plaintiffs request for sanctions is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/19/12.(bnbcd, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 47 plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/29/2011.(erv, )
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER DENIED AS WITHDRAWN 29 Defendant Sun River Energy, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order, Pursuant to the filing of the Notice of Withdrawal 34 , IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for May 27, 2011, at 9:30 a.m., Mou ntain Daylight Time, will still go forward, but the motions hearing portion is no longer necessary. Out-of-state defense counsel for Sun River Energy, Inc. may appear for this hearing telephonically by calling Chambers at the appropriate time at 303/844-6408. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/23/2011.(erv, )
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying as moot 10 Defendant Sun River Energy, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss; Denying as moot 11 Defendant Sun River Energy, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss; Denying as moot 19 Defendant Mountain Share Transfer, Inc.s Motion for Joinder of Defendant Sun River Energy, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss and Mountain Share Transfer, Inc.s Motion In the Alternative to Stay by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/4/2011.(erv, )
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/4/11. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nova Leasing, LLC v. Sun River Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Share Transfer, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Jean Hessler
Represented By: Patrick John Kanouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun River Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Robin Richie
Represented By: Louis Leonard Galvis
Represented By: David Reese Clouston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Mountain Share Transfer, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Jean Hessler
Represented By: Patrick John Kanouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sun River Energy, Inc.
Represented By: David Reese Clouston
Represented By: Louis Leonard Galvis
Represented By: Christopher Robin Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nova Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Tobin Duff Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?